AB102
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 15, 2008.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions governing problem gambling. (BDR 40-329)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 326.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 27, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 04, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 12, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Not Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 07, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Education     May. 11, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     May. 14, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Education     May. 15, 2009     01:25 PM    Minutes          Reconsider previous action on: 5-20-09   Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Education     May. 20, 2009     02:15 PM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 17   Yea 34,   Nay 8,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 22   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.256     Amend. No.867   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 17, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 16, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 256.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2009

Apr 20, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To committee.

May 18, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 19, 2009

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2009

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 867.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .

May 22, 2009

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 867 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 23, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 326.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.