AB104
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 31, 2008.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parnell

Revises the provisions governing the failure to appear in court for the commission of certain misdemeanor traffic offenses. (BDR 14-95)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 13, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 26, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 12, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 31, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Jan 02, 2009

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)