SB113
Introduced in the Senate on Jan 23, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Horsford

Makes various changes relating to the Advisory Commission on the Administration of Justice. (BDR 14-626)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 458.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 16, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Feb. 26, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 26, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Apr. 06, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Jun. 01, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun. 01   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun. 01   Yea 36,   Nay 6,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.20     Amend. No.1004   

Bill History

Jan 23, 2009

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Jan 26, 2009

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 16, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Mar 30, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 01, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 20.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 02, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 01, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1004.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 6.) To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 458.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.