AB114
Introduced in the Assembly on Jan 23, 2009.
By: Judiciary

Makes changes concerning compensation to victims of crime. (BDR 16-624)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 40.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 23, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     Feb. 26, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 10, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Mar. 11, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 11, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 20, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Feb. 25   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 29   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.561   

Bill History

Jan 23, 2009

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Jan 26, 2009

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 23, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Feb 24, 2009

  • Read second time.

Feb 25, 2009

Feb 26, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Apr 24, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 28, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 561.) To printer.

Apr 29, 2009

May 01, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 561 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 02, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 06, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 40.
  • Effective May 6, 2009.