AB116
Introduced in the Assembly on Jan 26, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Carpenter

Revises provisions concerning compensation for victims of crime. (BDR 16-1)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 147.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 23, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Feb. 26, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 12, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 30, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May. 07, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May. 11, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 15   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 18   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.53   

Bill History

Jan 26, 2009

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 53.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2009

Apr 16, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 15, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 18, 2009

May 19, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 22, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 147.
  • Effective May 22, 2009.