AB117
Introduced in the Assembly on Jan 27, 2009.
By: Corrections, Parole, and Probation

Makes various changes relating to parole hearings. (BDR 16-630)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 148.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Feb. 24, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Apr. 07, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Apr. 09, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May. 06, 2009     08:15 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May. 11, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 16   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 18   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.360   

Bill History

Jan 27, 2009

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To printer.

Jan 28, 2009

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 02, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption.

Apr 15, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 360.) To printer.

Apr 16, 2009

Apr 17, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 15, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 18, 2009

May 19, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 22, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 148.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.