AB120
Introduced in the Assembly on Jan 27, 2009.
By: Judiciary

Makes changes concerning orders for protection of victims of sexual assault. (BDR 15-625)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 68.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 23, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 26, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 03, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 20, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 24, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 09   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May. 01   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Jan 27, 2009

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Jan 28, 2009

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 06, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 09, 2009

Apr 13, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Apr 24, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 28, 2009

  • Read second time.

Apr 29, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 30, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 01, 2009

May 02, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 05, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 11, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 68.
  • Effective May 11, 2009.