SB142
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 17, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
McGinness

Establishes the crime of criminal gang recruitment. (BDR 15-723)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 112.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 27, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 17, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 30, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May. 08, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Senate Judiciary     May. 11, 2009     11:50 AM    Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar. 09   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 06   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.589   

Bill History

Feb 17, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 02, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 04, 2009

  • Read second time.

Mar 05, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 09, 2009

Mar 10, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 02, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 05, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 589.) To printer.

May 06, 2009

May 08, 2009

  • In Senate.

May 12, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 589 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 15, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 19, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 112.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.