SB28
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 05, 2008.
By: Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation

Revises reporting requirements concerning missing persons and unidentified dead bodies. (BDR 43-315)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 20.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 10, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 20, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Feb. 12   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 24   Yea 38,   Nay 0,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Dec 05, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 08, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 10, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Feb 11, 2009

  • Read second time.

Feb 12, 2009

Feb 13, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Apr 22, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 23, 2009

  • Read second time.

Apr 24, 2009

Apr 28, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Apr 29, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 04, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 20.
  • Effective May 4, 2009.