SB34
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 05, 2008.
By: Judiciary

Makes certain changes concerning the use of court reporters in certain court proceedings. (BDR 14-397)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 173.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 04, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 17, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 26, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 05, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 14, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar. 10   Yea 19,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May. 16   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Dec 05, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 08, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 02, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 04, 2009

  • Read second time.

Mar 05, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 09, 2009

  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 10, 2009

Mar 11, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 15, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 16, 2009

May 18, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 19, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 22, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 173.
  • Effective May 22, 2009.