SB35
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 05, 2008.
By: Judiciary

Revises provisions relating to the prosecution of certain offenses. (BDR 15-272)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 476.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 05, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 26, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 22, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 07, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May. 20, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do not concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 06   Yea 18,   Nay 3,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 13   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.13     Amend. No.624     Amend. No.CA20   

Bill History

Dec 05, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 08, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 01, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 02, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 13.) To printer.

Apr 03, 2009

Apr 06, 2009

Apr 09, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 12, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 624.) To printer.

May 13, 2009

May 15, 2009

  • In Senate.

May 20, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 624 not concurred in. To Assembly.

May 21, 2009

  • In Assembly.

May 29, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 624 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

May 30, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 01, 2009

  • From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 624 and further amend.
  • Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • Conference report adopted by Assembly.

Jun 02, 2009

  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 03, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 08, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 476.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.