SB44
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 05, 2008.
By: Judiciary

Designates certain employees of the Department of Corrections as category II peace officers. (BDR 23-304)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 175.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 20, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 26, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     Mar. 16, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 16, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Government Affairs     May. 11, 2009     09:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar. 24   Yea 19,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 1
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May. 13   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Dec 05, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 08, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 02, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 04, 2009

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

Mar 16, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Notice of exemption.

Mar 17, 2009

  • Read second time.

Mar 19, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 24, 2009

Mar 27, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 12, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 13, 2009

May 15, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 17, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 22, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 175.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.