AB35
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 05, 2008.
By: Judiciary

Revises provisions governing petitions by offenders under lifetime supervision for release from lifetime supervision. (BDR 14-312)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Feb. 17, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Feb. 26, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.25   

Bill History

Dec 05, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To printer.

Dec 07, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 02, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 25.) To printer.

Apr 07, 2009

Apr 09, 2009

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 22, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)