AB301
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 11, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Kihuen , Denis , Munford , Anderson , Arberry , Bobzien , Buckley , Christensen , Claborn , Kirkpatrick , Leslie , McClain , Mortenson , Oceguera , Parnell , Pierce , Segerblom , Smith , Spiegel

Requires the Governor to proclaim March 31 as “Cesar Chavez Day” in the State of Nevada. (BDR 19-530)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 106.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar. 30, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr. 29, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     May. 06, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 13   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May. 12   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 11, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 12, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 31, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 01, 2009

  • Read second time.

Apr 02, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 09, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 10, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 13, 2009

Apr 14, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 08, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 11, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 12, 2009

May 13, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 15, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 18, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 106.
  • Effective May 18, 2009.