SB368
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Taxation

Imposes an additional licensing fee on certain heavyweight motor vehicles. (BDR 58-942)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Mar. 27, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 09, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          Indefinitely Postponed

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)