SB369
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Taxation

Imposes a tax on the use of prostitution services and establishes the Office of Ombudsman for Sex Workers. (BDR 32-1228)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 07, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 09, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          Amendment proposed, failed

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)