AB47
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 06, 2008.
By: Corrections, Parole, and Probation

Revises provisions relating to specialty courts. (BDR 14-409)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 113.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 16, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 12, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 03, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 14, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 30, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Health and Education     May. 11, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 16   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 12   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.212   

Bill History

Dec 06, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 07, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 15, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 212.) To printer.

Apr 16, 2009

Apr 17, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Apr 30, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 01, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 02, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 04, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 05, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 06, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 08, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 11, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 12, 2009

May 13, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 15, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 19, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 113.
  • Effective May 19, 2009.