SB60
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 07, 2008.
By: Health and Education

Revises provisions governing buildings and other property that has been used in crimes involving methamphetamine or certain other substances. (BDR 40-542)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 220.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Education     Feb. 23, 2009     03:15 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 23, 2009     03:15 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Apr. 22, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May. 13, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 28   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 20   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.131     Amend. No.704   

Bill History

Dec 07, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer.

Dec 08, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 15, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 131.)
  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 16, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Apr 24, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

Apr 28, 2009

Apr 29, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 19, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 704.) To printer.

May 20, 2009

May 21, 2009

  • In Senate.

May 22, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 704 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 23, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 220.
  • Effective May 26, 2009 for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act, and on July 1, 2009, for all other purposes.