AB63
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 10, 2008.
By: Judiciary

Makes various changes to provisions regarding justice courts. (BDR 1-398)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 143.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 04, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 11, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 26, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May. 11, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Apr. 20   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 18   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.24     Amend. No.535   

Bill History

Dec 10, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 11, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 24.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 20, 2009

Apr 21, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 15, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 18, 2009

May 19, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 22, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 143.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.