SB85
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2008.
By: Judiciary

Revises provisions relating to the financial support of regional facilities for the detention of children. (BDR 5-407)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Mar. 04, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 09, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     Jun. 01, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        

Other Amendments   
(see bill history below)
 Amend. No.1010   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Dec 17, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 16, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 01, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)