AB83
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 15, 2008.
By: Health and Human Services

Makes various changes concerning the reporting and investigation of allegations of child abuse and neglect. (BDR 38-333)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Feb. 16, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          To Subcommittee
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar. 05, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar. 16, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 15, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Dec 17, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)