AB85
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 15, 2008.
By: Corrections, Parole, and Probation

Provides for the formation of a committee to study laws concerning sex offender registration. (BDR 14-259)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 116.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Mar. 31, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Apr. 07, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May. 01, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 17   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 12   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.254   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To printer.

Dec 17, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 17, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 254.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 01, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 02, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 04, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 05, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 06, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 08, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 11, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 12, 2009

May 13, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 15, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 19, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 116.
  • Effective May 19, 2009.