AB93
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 15, 2008.
By: Judiciary

Revises the definition of the crime of assault. (BDR 15-313)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 37.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 13, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 26, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 20, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 24, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 06   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 29   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.23   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 17, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 01, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 02, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 23.) To printer.

Apr 03, 2009

Apr 06, 2009

Apr 08, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Apr 24, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 28, 2009

  • Read second time.

Apr 29, 2009

May 01, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 02, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 06, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 37.
  • Effective May 6, 2009.