AB99
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 15, 2008.
By: Judiciary

Makes various changes relating to public safety. (BDR 15-410)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 04, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 13, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 12, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 27, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 29, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 12, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Rescind previous action on: 4-29-09   Do pass, as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May. 20, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May. 26, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 12   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.50   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 17, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 02, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 50.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 12, 2009

May 15, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)