AB105
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 31, 2008.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Gansert

Makes various changes concerning genetic marker testing of certain criminal defendants. (BDR 14-51)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 39.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 18, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 03, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 27, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 15   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 30   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.211   

Bill History

Dec 31, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Jan 02, 2009

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 211.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2009

Apr 16, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Apr 28, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 29, 2009

  • Read second time.

Apr 30, 2009

May 01, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 02, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 06, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 39.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.