SB3
Introduced in the Senate on Nov 19, 2008.
By: Legislative Operations and Elections

Creates the Legislative Committee on Child Welfare and Juvenile Justice. (BDR 17-213)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 452.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Feb. 10, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 28, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 21, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     May. 31, 2009     10:45 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 28   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun. 01   Yea 38,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.941     Amend. No.1001   

Bill History

Nov 19, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Nov 21, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 16, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

May 28, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 941.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 29, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To committee.

Jun 01, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1001.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 4.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 1001 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 452.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.