AB435
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Pierce , Ohrenschall , Arberry , Hogan , Kihuen , Kirkpatrick , Mortenson , Munford , Segerblom , Parks

Makes various changes to the provisions governing mechanical voting systems. (BDR 24-463)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr. 02, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr. 09, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)