AB33
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 05, 2008.
By: Judiciary

Revises provisions governing subsequent convictions of battery which constitutes domestic violence. (BDR 15-261)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 02, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 04, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 26, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 08, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 05, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 07, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 02, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption.

Mar 27, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 30, 2009

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)