SB349
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Judiciary

Makes various changes relating to constructional defects. (BDR 3-1151)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 23, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 01, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 08, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 09, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 16   Yea 19,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.323   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 15, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 323.) To printer.

Apr 16, 2009

Apr 17, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)