AB34
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 05, 2008.
By: Corrections, Parole, and Probation

Authorizes prisoners in certain state correctional institutions or facilities to use certain electronic communication devices under certain circumstances. (BDR 16-307)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Feb. 10, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Feb. 26, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Not Heard
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Mar. 12, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     Mar. 13, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 05, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To printer.

Dec 07, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 12, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 13, 2009

  • Read second time.

Mar 16, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 17, 2009

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 22, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)