SB283
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks , Coffin

Revises provisions governing the rights of domestic partners. (BDR 11-1100)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 393.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 27, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 08, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 08, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 12, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 21   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 15   Yea 26,   Nay 14,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Votes in Response to Governor's Veto  (2/3 Majority Required)
   Senate Override (Not Sustain)    (2nd Reprint)       May. 30   Yea 14,   Nay 7,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Override (Not Sustain)    (2nd Reprint)       May. 31   Yea 28,   Nay 14,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.528     Amend. No.674   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 26, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 528.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.

Apr 22, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 13, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 674.) To printer.

May 14, 2009

May 15, 2009

May 16, 2009

  • In Senate.

May 19, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 674 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 20, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 25, 2009

  • Vetoed by the Governor.

May 26, 2009

  • Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message.

May 30, 2009

  • Made Special Order of Business for Saturday, May 30, 2009, at 6:42 p.m.
  • Bill read. Veto not sustained. (Yeas: 14, Nays: 7.)
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.

May 31, 2009

Jun 01, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • Chapter 393.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.