SJR10
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Washington

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to remove term limits for certain public officers. (BDR C-665)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar. 31, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 14, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May. 22   Yea 9,   Nay 11,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 17, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

May 15, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 18, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 19, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 22, 2009

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)