Events
Legislative committees and committees affiliated with the Legislature are displayed as links within the panels below.
Senate Floor Session
The Agenda will be posted 30 minutes prior to commencement.
The Agenda will be posted 30 minutes prior to commencement.
The Senate is scheduled to convene at 11:00 AM on Monday, April 28, 2025.
Assembly Floor Session
The Agenda will be posted 30 minutes prior to commencement.
The Agenda will be posted 30 minutes prior to commencement.
The Assembly is scheduled to convene at 11:30 AM on Monday, April 28, 2025.
- Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
- Videoconferenced to Room 6 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.
- Room 3137 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
- Videoconferenced to Room 2 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.
SB458 (WS)
Monday, April 28, 2025
8:00 AM
- Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
- Videoconferenced to Room 2 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.
8:00 AM
9:00 AM
9:00 AM
1:00 PM
1:00 PM
1:30 PM
1:30 PM
3:30 PM
3:30 PM
4:00 PM
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
8:00 AM
8:00 AM
- Room 2135 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
- Videoconferenced to Room 6 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.
9:00 AM
1:00 PM
1:00 PM
Canceled
1:30 PM
1:30 PM
3:30 PM
3:30 PM
- Room 2149 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
- Room 5 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.
3:30 PM
4:00 PM
4:00 PM
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
8:00 AM
- Room 3137 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
- Videoconferenced to Room 2 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.
8:00 AM
8:00 AM
- Room 2135 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
- Videoconferenced to Room 6 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.
1:00 PM
1:30 PM
3:30 PM
4:00 PM
Thursday, May 1, 2025
8:00 AM
- Room 3137 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
- Videoconferenced to Room 2 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.
8:00 AM
- Room 2135 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
- Videoconferenced to Room 6 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.
9:30 AM
- Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
- Videoconferenced to Room 165 of the Nevada Legislature Office Building, 7230 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV 89119
1:00 PM
1:00 PM
Canceled
1:30 PM
4:00 PM
Friday, May 2, 2025
8:00 AM
- Room 2135 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
- Videoconferenced to Room 6 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.
8:00 AM
- Room 3137 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
- Videoconferenced to Room 2 of the Nevada Legislature Hearing Rooms, 7120 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV.
1:00 PM
3:30 PM
Canceled
Wednesday, June 18, 2025
9:00 AM
- Room 165 of the Nevada Legislature Office Building, 7230 Amigo Street, Las Vegas, NV 89119
- Videoconferenced to Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.
Friday, June 20, 2025
8:00 AM
Nevada Girls State
- The Assembly Chamber of the Legislative Building, 401 South Carson Street, Carson City, NV.