Daily Schedule for Saturday, April 18, 2015
Show only my meetings
There are no meetings currently scheduled for this date.
Upcoming Floor Sessions
Upcoming Deadlines
Tuesday, April 21, 2015
First House Passage
Friday, May 01, 2015
Economic Forum Report Due
Monday, May 04, 2015
Start Resolving Budget Differences
Friday, May 15, 2015
Committee Passage (Second House)
Thursday, May 21, 2015
Finish Budget Differences
Friday, May 22, 2015
Second House Passage
Wednesday, May 27, 2015
Budget Bills Introduced; Exempt Bills from Committee