Thursday, August 27, 2015 - The 78th Session adjourned Sine Die on June 1, 2015
Daily Schedule for Thursday, August 27, 2015
Show only my meetings
Select a date during the 78th (2015) Session (2/2/2015 - 6/1/2015) to see that day's meetings.
Floor Sessions of the 78th (2015) Session
Deadlines for the 78th (2015) Session
Friday, February 06, 2015
Joint Subcommittees Start
Monday, February 09, 2015
Legislators' BDR Requests
Monday, February 16, 2015
Committees' BDR Requests; Legislators' BDR Details
Monday, February 23, 2015
Committees' BDR Details
Monday, March 16, 2015
Legislators' Bill Introductions
Monday, March 23, 2015
Committees' Bill Introductions
Tuesday, March 31, 2015
Start Closing Budgets
Friday, April 10, 2015
Committee Passage (First House)
Tuesday, April 21, 2015
First House Passage
Friday, May 01, 2015
Economic Forum Report Due
Monday, May 04, 2015
Start Resolving Budget Differences
Friday, May 15, 2015
Committee Passage (Second House)
Thursday, May 21, 2015
Finish Budget Differences
Friday, May 22, 2015
Second House Passage
Wednesday, May 27, 2015
Budget Bills Introduced; Exempt Bills from Committee