S-501
AB47
Rural Regional Behavioral Health Policy Board
Establishes a pilot program to address behavioral health crisis response needs in certain rural counties.
show Note: (None)
8/31/2018
Click to track
34-502
SB80
Clark County School District
Provides for creation and implementation of plan to provide services to pupils in traumatic situations.
show Note: (None)
8/14/2018
Chapter 607
Click to track
10-503
SB148
Senate Committee on Commerce and Labor
Revises provisions relating to the conversion of manufactured home parks.
show Note: (None)
9/5/2018
Click to track
48-504
AB95
Legislative Committee on Public Lands (NRS 218E.510)
Revises provisions relating to water.
show Note: (None)
9/7/2018
Chapter 304
Click to track
33-505
AB96
Legislative Committee on Public Lands (NRS 218E.510)
Requires the creation of an historic sites passport program.
show Note: (None)
9/7/2018
Chapter 589
Click to track
R-506
AJR8
Legislative Committee on Public Lands (NRS 218E.510)
AJR: Expresses the opposition of the Nevada Legislature to the elimination of the Nevada office of the Bureau of Land Management.
show Note: (None)
9/7/2018
File 27
Click to track
R-507
SJR4
Legislative Committee on Public Lands (NRS 218E.510)
SJR: Expresses the support of the Nevada Legislature for the federal Recovering America's Wildlife Act.
show Note: (None)
9/7/2018
File 31
Click to track
S-508
AB250
Legislative Committee on Public Lands (NRS 218E.510)
Makes an appropriation for members of the Legislative Committee on Public Lands to attend informational tours in Washington, D.C.
show Note: (None)
9/7/2018
Chapter 489
Click to track
R-509
ACR4
Legislative Committee on Public Lands (NRS 218E.510)
ACR: Directs the Legislative Commission to appoint an interim study concerning wildfires.
show Note: (None)
9/7/2018
File 46
Click to track
26-510
SB96
Legislative Committee on Public Lands (NRS 218E.510)
Establishes a program to provide matching funds to assist in obtaining certain federal grants.
show Note: (None)
9/7/2018
Click to track
R-511
AJR3
Legislative Committee on Public Lands (NRS 218E.510)
AJR: Revises provisions relating to public lands issues.
show Note: (None)
9/7/2018
File 23
Click to track
512
Legislative Committee on Public Lands (NRS 218E.510)
Revises provisions relating to public lands issues.
show Note: (None)
9/7/2018
Click to track
513
Legislative Committee on Public Lands (NRS 218E.510)
Revises provisions relating to public lands issues.
show Note: (None)
9/7/2018
Click to track
54-514
SB186
Senator Seevers Gansert
Enacts provisions governing the interstate practice of physical therapy.
show Note: (None)
9/4/2018
Chapter 277
Click to track
14-515
Senator Segerblom
Repeals provisions governing sex offenders which were originally enacted for purposes of the federal Adam Walsh Act.
show Note: (None)
9/9/2018
Click to track
3-516
SB151
Senator Ratti
Revises provisions relating to certain proceedings concerning real property.
show Note: (None)
9/11/2018
Chapter 600
Click to track
38-517
SB293
Senator Ratti
Revises provisions relating to protection of children.
show Note: (None)
9/11/2018
Chapter 513
Click to track
54-518
SB128
Legislative Commission (NRS 218E.150)
Makes various changes relating to professional and occupational licensing boards.
show Note: (None)
On Behalf Of Sunset Subcommittee (NRS 232B.210) 9/12/2018
Click to track
54-519
SB98
Legislative Commission (NRS 218E.150)
Revises provisions governing the practice of homeopathic medicine.
show Note: (None)
On Behalf Of Sunset Subcommittee (NRS 232B.210) 9/14/2018
Chapter 561
Click to track
R-520
SCR6
Legislative Commission (NRS 218E.150)
SCR: Provides for the creation of an interim study regarding professional and occupational licensing boards.
show Note: (None)
On Behalf Of Sunset Subcommittee (NRS 232B.210) 9/14/2018
File 39
Click to track
32-521
SB152
Senator Seevers Gansert
Eliminates certain filing requirements for certain businesses.
show Note: (None)
9/19/2018
Click to track
54-522
SB271
Senator Hardy
Revises provisions relating to certain professions.
show Note: (None)
9/19/2018
Click to track
54-523
SB170
Senator Hardy
Revises provisions relating to health care.
show Note: (None)
9/19/2018
Click to track
40-524
SB116
Senator Hardy
Makes changes concerning medical decisions for certain patients.
show Note: (None)
9/20/2018
Click to track
40-525
SB189
Senator Ratti
Revises provisions relating to health care.
show Note: (None)
9/21/2018
Click to track
40-526
SB92
Legislative Committee on Health Care (NRS 439B.200)
Revises provisions concerning certain residential facilities.
show Note: (None)
9/25/2018
Chapter 75
Click to track
57-527
SB234
Legislative Committee on Health Care (NRS 439B.200)
Requires the collection of certain data concerning providers of health care.
show Note: (None)
9/26/2018
Chapter 101
Click to track
53-528
Senator Segerblom
Revises provisions relating to the classification of persons as employees or independent contractors.
show Note: (None)
9/27/2018
Click to track
40-529
AB97
Legislative Committee on Health Care (NRS 439B.200)
Revises provisions relating to public health.
show Note: (None)
9/25/2018
Click to track
43-530
SB478
Senate Committee on Commerce and Labor
Revises provisions relating to certain businesses.
show Note: (None)
9/29/2018
Click to track
57-531
SB482
Legislative Committee on Health Care (NRS 439B.200)
Revises provisions relating to health insurance.
show Note: (None)
10/2/2018
Chapter 251
Click to track
S-532
AB104
Assemblywoman Swank
Revises provisions governing the Nevada Main Street Program.
show Note: (None)
10/2/2018
Chapter 486
Click to track
54-533
Senator Cannizzaro (Originally requested by Senator Atkinson)
Revises provisions concerning certain persons who perform work relating to plumbing.
show Note: (None)
10/3/2018
Click to track
38-534
SB24
Nevada Silver Haired Legislative Forum
Revises provisions governing the Nevada Silver Haired Legislative Forum.
show Note: (None)
10/9/2018
Chapter 112
Click to track
S-535
AB214
Assemblyman Kramer
Provides for a feasibility study relating to further development of a museum at the Nevada State Prison.
show Note: (None)
10/12/2018
Click to track
23-536
SB459
Senate Committee on Government Affairs (Originally requested by Senator Segerblom)
Provides for collective bargaining by employees of the Nevada System of Higher Education (NSHE).
show Note: (None)
10/14/2018
Click to track
19-537
SB183
Senator Seevers Gansert
Makes various changes relating to governmental administration.
show Note: (None)
10/18/2018
Click to track
57-538
SB385
Senator Parks
Revises provisions relating to self-service storage facilities.
show Note: (None)
10/23/2018
Chapter 220
Click to track
34-539
AB168
Assemblyman Thompson
Revises provisions governing expulsion of pupils.
show Note: (None)
10/30/2018
Chapter 559
Click to track
20-540
SB460
Senate Committee on Government Affairs
Revises provisions relating to public administrators in certain counties.
show Note: (None)
11/1/2018
Chapter 270
Click to track
48-541
SB140
Senate Committee on Natural Resources
Revises provisions relating to appropriations of water in water basins.
show Note: (None)
11/2/2018
Chapter 405
Click to track
14-542
AB125
Assemblywoman Neal
Revises provisions relating to criminal procedure.
show Note: (None)
11/2/2018
Click to track
52-543
AB360
Assemblywoman Neal
Revises provisions governing loan practices.
show Note: (None)
11/2/2018
Click to track
38-544
AB223
Assemblywoman Neal
Revises provisions governing certain dental care.
show Note: (None)
11/2/2018
Chapter 379
Click to track
22-545
AB135
Assemblyman Carrillo
Revises provisions governing easements.
show Note: (None)
11/3/2018
Click to track
54-546
SB372
Senator Seevers Gansert
Revises provisions relating to behavioral health services for pupils.
show Note: (None)
11/6/2018
Click to track
52-547
SB302
Senator Seevers Gansert
Revises provisions relating to protection of sensitive data collected by governmental agencies.
show Note: (None)
11/6/2018
Chapter 412
Click to track
34-548
SB343
Senator Seevers Gansert
Requires training for members of certain educational governing bodies and requires additional transparency for school expenditures.
show Note: (None)
11/6/2018
Click to track
38-549
SB226
Senator Spearman
Revises provisions relating to health care.
show Note: (None)
11/8/2018
Click to track
39-550
SB266
Senator Spearman
Revises provisions relating to mental health.
show Note: (None)
11/8/2018
Click to track