Administrative Regulation Notices

Meetings and Workshops

AB252 of the 77th Session
Today is Sunday, April 22, 2018

04/23/2018    1:30PM
Meeting Notice
Colorado River Commission of Nevada
Notice of Workshop for the Colorado River Commission of Nevada
Grant Sawyer State Office Building, Room 3100, 555 E, Washington Ave, Las Vegas, NV 89101

04/24/2018    10:00AM
Meeting Notice
Department of Motor Vehicles
Notice of Workshop on Proposed Regulations R136-17-V8
LCB Room 2134, 401 S. Carson St. Carson City, NV 89701, Videoconferenced to Grant Sawyer Building, Room 4412 E, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV 89101 and Great Basin College Room TBD, 1500 College Pkwy, Elko, NV 89801

04/26/2018    9:00AM
Meeting Notice
Department of Education
Sate Board of Education
Department of Education, 700 E. 5th St, Carson City - boardroom and Department of Education, 9890 S. Maryland Pkwy, Las Vegas - Boardroom

04/27/2018    9:00AM
Meeting Notice
Commission on Mineral Resources
Notice of Public Hearing for Adoption of Regulations
Legislative Counsel Bureau-401 South Carson Street #1214 Carson City, NV 89701

04/27/2018    9:00AM
Meeting Notice
Nevada State Board of Athletic Trainers
Board Meeting and Public Workshop
University of Nevada Reno, 1664 N. Virginia Street, Room #47, Reno, Nevada 89557 Videoconference with University of Nevada Las Vegas, 4505 S. Maryland Parkway, System Computing Services, Room #102, Las Vegas, Nevada 89154

05/03/2018    9:00AM
Meeting Notice
Nevada Taxicab Authority
Small Business Impact Statement
2080 E. Flamingo, Suite 114, Las Vegas, NV 89119

05/03/2018    9:00AM
Meeting Notice
Nevada Taxicab Authority
Notice of Workshop to Solicit Comments on Proposed Regulations
2080 E. Flamingo, Suite 114, Las Vegas, NV 89119

05/03/2018    9:00AM
Meeting Notice
Nevada Taxicab Authority
Notice to Determine Small Business Impact
2080 E. Flamingo, Suite 114, Las Vegas, NV 89119

05/03/2018    1:00PM
Meeting Notice
State Environmental Commission
Workshop - Bureau of Safe Drinking Water
Las Vegas: NDEP, 2030 E. Flamingo Rd, Suite 230, Red Rock Conf. Room

05/04/2018    8:30AM
Meeting Notice
Department of Public Safety, State Fire Marshal Division
State Fire Marshal Workshop
Nevada Department of Transportation Headquarters, Room 302, 1263 S. Stewart Street, Carson City, NV

05/04/2018    9:30AM
Meeting Notice
State Environmental Commission
Workshop - Bureau of Safe Drinking Water
Carson City: Bryan Building, 901 S. Stewart St., Tahoe Hearing Room (2nd Floor)

05/04/2018    10:30AM
Meeting Notice
Nevada Department of Wildlife
Nevada Board of Wildlife Commission
Washoe County Commission Chambers, 1001 E 9th Street, Building A, Reno, Nevada 89512

05/04/2018    10:30AM
Meeting Notice
Nevada Department of Wildlife
Nevada Board of Wildlife Commission
Washoe County Commission Chambers, 101 E 9th Street, Building A, Reno, Nevada 89512

05/04/2018    1:00PM
Meeting Notice
Division of Public and Behavioral Health
Notice of Public Hearing- Intent to Adopt Regulations LCB File No. R053-18
4150 Technology Way, Room 303 Carson City; Desert Regional Center 1391 S. Jones Blvd., Training Room Las Vegas

05/05/2018    8:30AM
Meeting Notice
Nevada Department of Wildlife
Nevada Board of Wildlife Commission
Washoe County Commission Chambers, 1001 E 9th Street, Building A, Reno, Nevada 89512

05/07/2018    9:00AM
Meeting Notice
Board of Oriental Medicine
Workshop
Office of the Attorney General, 555 E. Washington Ave., #4500, Las Vegas, NV 89101 and Office of the Attorney General, 5420 Kietzke Lane, #202, Reno, NV 89511

05/07/2018    9:00AM
Meeting Notice
Board of Oriental Medicine
Workshop
Office of the Attorney General, 555 E. Washington Ave., #4500, Las Vegas, NV 89101 and Office of the Attorney General, 5420 Kietzke Lane, #202, Reno, NV 89511

05/07/2018    9:00AM
Meeting Notice
Board of Oriental Medicine
Workshop
Office of the Attorney General, 555 E. Washington Ave., #4500, Las Vegas, NV 89101 and Office of the Attorney General, 5420 Kietzke Lane, #202, Reno, NV 89511

05/07/2018    9:00AM
Meeting Notice
Board of Oriental Medicine
Workshop
Office of the Attorney General, 555 E. Washington Ave., #4500, Las Vegas, NV 89101 and Office of the Attorney General, 5420 Kietzke Lane, #202, Reno, NV 89511

05/07/2018    9:00AM
Meeting Notice
H&HS, DCFS Family Programs Office
Cancelled Public Hearing
LCB in Carson City, Grant Sawyer Building in Las Vegas

05/07/2018    9:00AM
Meeting Notice
H&HS, Division of Child & Family Services, Family Programs Office
**CANCELLED** Public Hearing for NAC 424, AB 99
LCB in Carson City and Grant Sawyer Buildling in Las Vegas

05/07/2018    9:00AM
Meeting Notice
H&HS, Division of Child & Family Services, Family Programs Office
Notice of Intent to Adopt Regulation NAC 424, AB 99
LCB in Carson City and Grant Sawyer Building in Las Vegas

05/07/2018    10:00AM
Meeting Notice
Nevada Department of Taxation
Notice of Hearing for the Adoption of LCB File No. R038-17
Nevada Legislative Building 401 S Carson Street, Room 2134, Carson City, NV and Legislative Counsel Bureau, Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Avenue, Room 4412, Las Vegas, NV

05/07/2018    10:00AM
Meeting Notice

05/08/2018    9:00AM
Meeting Notice

05/08/2018    1:30PM
Meeting Notice
Colorado River Commission of Nevada
Notice of Intent to Act Upon a Regulation
Grant Sawyer State Office Building, Room 3100, 555 E, Washington Ave, Las Vegas, NV 89101

05/10/2018    9:00AM
Meeting Notice
Nevada Department of Agiculture, Plant Industry Division
NAC554 Workshop
405 S. 21st Street Sparks, NV 89431

05/10/2018    2:30PM
Meeting Notice
Governor's Office of Energy
Notice of Hearing for the Amendment of Regulations of the Governor's Office of Energy
The Builders Association of Northern Nevada 5484 Reno Corporate Drive, Reno, NV 89511

05/11/2018    9:00AM
Meeting Notice
Nevada Department of Education
Public Hearing
Dept of Education, 700 E. %th St, Carson City-boardroom Dept of Education, 9890 s. Maryland Pkwy, Las Vegas Boardroom and Univ of Nv Cooperative Ext, 8050 Paradise Rd, LV, Classroom B and C

05/14/2018    9:30AM
Meeting Notice
Department of Business and Industry, Division of Insurance
Regulation Workshop: LCB File No. R028-18
1818 E. College Pkwy. Ste. 103, Carson City, NV (1st Floor Hearing Room) -- Videoconferenced to 3300 W. Sahara Ave. Ste. 275, Las Vegas, NV (4th Floor Nevada Room)

05/16/2018    9:00AM
Meeting Notice
Department of Education
May 16, 2018 COPS Regulation Public Hearings
NDE, 9890 S Maryland Pkwy, Las Vegas, NV 89183, NDE 700 E. Fifth St, Carson City, NV, Great Basin College, 1500 College Pkwy, Elko, NV

05/17/2018    9:00AM
Meeting Notice
Nevada State Board of Nursing
Notice of Intent to Act Upon Regulation
SpringHill Suites Marriott, 2989 Paradise Road, Las Vegas, Nevada 89109

05/17/2018    11:00AM
Meeting Notice
Governor's Office of Energy
Notice of Hearing for the Amendment of Regulations of the Governor's Office of Energy
The Southern Nevada Home Builders Association - 4175 S. Riley Street., Ste. 100, Las Vegas, NV 89147

05/21/2018    1:30PM
Meeting Notice
Department of Business and Industry, Division of Insurance
Hearing to Adopt Proposed Regulation LCB File No. R087-17
1818 E. College Pkwy. Ste. 103, Carson City, NV (1st Floor Hearing Room) -- Videoconferenced to 3300 W. Sahara Ave. Ste. 275, Las Vegas, NV (4th Floor Nevada Room)

This meeting notice was released in the last 48 hours.
05/22/2018    2:30PM
Meeting Notice
Nevada Board of Dispensing Opticians
Hearing for the Adoption of Regulation R137-17
Clark County Library; 1401 E. Flamingo Rd.; Las Vegas, NV 89119; Large Conference Room

05/23/2018    9:00AM
Meeting Notice
State Environmental Commission
Regulatory Hearing
Nevada Legislative Building, Room 2135, located at 401 South Carson Street. The meeting will also be video-conferenced in Las Vegas at the Grant Sawyer Building, Room 4412E, located at 555 East Washington Avenue.

05/23/2018    1:00PM
Meeting Notice
Governor's Office of Energy
Notice of Hearing for the Amendment of Regulations of the Governor's Office of Energy
Elko City Hall Council Chambers - 1753 College Ave., Elko, NV 89801

05/25/2018    9:30AM
Meeting Notice
Department of Business and Industry, Division of Insurance
Regulation Hearing: LCB File No. R028-18
1818 E. College Pkwy. Ste. 103, Carson City, NV (1st Floor Hearing Room) -- Videoconferenced to 3300 W. Sahara Ave. Ste. 275, Las Vegas, NV (4th Floor Nevada Room)

06/08/2018    9:00AM
Meeting Notice
Division of Public and Behavioral Health
Board of Health - Intent to Adopt Regulations - LCB File No. R158-17 - NAC Chapter 640D - Music Therapists
4150 Technology Way, Suite 303, Carson City, NV 89701

06/08/2018    9:00AM
Meeting Notice
Division of Public and Behavioral Health
Notice of Public Hearing (in conjunction with State Board of Health)
4150 Technology Way, Suite 303, Carson City, NV 89701

06/14/2018    10:00AM
Meeting Notice