Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag

Final District Plans:  Congressional, Legislative, and Board of Regents

The 2011 Legislative Session concluded with one redistricting measure that was approved and signed into law, Assembly Bill 570, that revises the districts from which the Board of Regents of the University of Nevada are elected. Copies of these maps and the related statistical tables are included below.

On December 8, 2011, First Judicial District Court Judge, James T. Russell, issued what is believed to be a final addendum to his October 27, 2011, order setting forth districts for the Nevada State Senate and Assembly and Nevada's Congressional Districts as drawn by the Court�s Special Masters (see Special Master's report). Copies of these maps and the related statistical data are included below.

Download District GIS Shapefiles
and Block Assignment/Equivalency Files
for Current Districts
Congressional Districts (click here to collapse or expand)
Districts are effective January 1, 2012, for the purposes of filing for office and for nominating and electing members, and on January 3, 2013, for all other purposes.
  • Maps (click here to collapse or expand)
Overview Maps:
Las Vegas Detail 17" x 22" (3.2 MB)  
Statewide 17" x 22" (3.5 MB)  
Individual District Maps:
Congressional District 1 34" x 44" (16.2 MB)
Congressional District 2 34" x 44" (13.1 MB)
Congressional District 3 34" x 44" (13.9 MB)
Congressional District 4 34" x 44" (13.6 MB)
Legislative Districts (click here to collapse or expand)
Districts are effective January 1, 2012, for the purposes of filing for office and for nominating and electing members, and on November 7, 2012, for all other purposes.
Senate Districts (click here to collapse or expand)
  • Maps (click here to collapse or expand)
Overview Maps:
Statewide 17" x 22" (3.3 MB)  
Las Vegas Detail 17" x 22" (2.9 MB)  
Reno-Sparks Detail 17" x 22" (2.4 MB)  
Individual District Maps:
Senate District 1 11" x 17" (1.5 MB) 34" x 44" (11.7 MB)
Senate District 2 11" x 17" (2.0MB) 34" x 44" (11.2 MB)
Senate District 3 11" x 17" (1.8 MB) 34" x 44" (11.8 MB)
Senate District 4 11" x 17" (2.1 MB) 34" x 44" (12.9 MB)
Senate District 5 11" x 17" (1.8 MB) 34" x 44" (12.3 MB)
Senate District 6 11" x 17" (1.8 MB) 34" x 44" (13.0 MB)
Senate District 7 11" x 17" (2.0 MB) 34" x 44" (11.9 MB)
Senate District 8 11" x 17" (2.0 MB) 34" x 44" (12.7 MB)
Senate District 9 11" x 17" (1.9 MB) 34" x 44" (10.3 MB)
Senate District 10 11" x 17" (2.2 MB) 34" x 44" (12.4 MB)
Senate District 11 11" x 17" (1.6 MB) 34" x 44" (11.1 MB)
Senate District 12 11" x 17" (2.0 MB) 34" x 44" (10.4 MB)
Senate District 13 11" x 17" (2.3 MB) 34" x 44" (11.5 MB)
Senate District 14 11" x 17" (2.2 MB) 34" x 44" (13.9 MB)
Senate District 15 11" x 17" (2.4 MB) 34" x 44" (10.7 MB)
Senate District 16 11" x 17" (1.9 MB) 34" x 44" (10.2 MB)
Senate District 17 11" x 17" (1.8 MB) 34" x 44" (12.2 MB)
Senate District 18 11" x 17" (1.8 MB) 34" x 44" (12.7 MB)
Senate District 19 11" x 17" (2.1 MB) 34" x 44" (11.0 MB)
Senate District 20 11" x 17" (2.2 MB) 34" x 44" (11.7 MB)
Senate District 21 11" x 17" (1.7 MB) 34" x 44" (10.1 MB)
Assembly Districts (click here to collapse or expand)
  • Maps (click here to collapse or expand)
Overview Maps:
Statewide 17" x 22" (3.6 MB)  
Las Vegas Detail 17" x 22" (3.5 MB)  
Reno-Sparks Detail 17" x 22" (2.8 MB)  
Individual District Maps:
Assembly District 1 11" x 17" (1.6 MB) 34" x 44" (10.2 MB)
Assembly District 2 11" x 17" (1.9 MB) 34" x 44" (12.0 MB)
Assembly District 3 11" x 17" (2.0 MB) 34" x 44" (11.6 MB)
Assembly District 4 11" x 17" (1.8 MB) 34" x 44" (12.5 MB)
Assembly District 5 11" x 17" (1.9 MB) 34" x 44" (12.9 MB)
Assembly District 6 11" x 17" (2.1 MB) 34" x 44" (12.5 MB)
Assembly District 7 11" x 17" (2.1 MB) 34" x 44" (13.3 MB)
Assembly District 8 11" x 17" (1.7 MB) 34" x 44" (11.7 MB)
Assembly District 9 11" x 17" (1.8 MB) 34" x 44" (9.8 MB)
Assembly District 10 11" x 17" (2.6 MB) 34" x 44" (12.6 MB)
Assembly District 11 11" x 17" (2.0 MB) 34" x 44" (11.3 MB)
Assembly District 12 11" x 17" (1.7 MB) 34" x 44" (10.3 MB)
Assembly District 13 11" x 17" (1.9 MB) 34" x 44" (11.8 MB)
Assembly District 14 11" x 17" (1.7 MB) 34" x 44" (11.2 MB)
Assembly District 15 11" x 17" (2.0 MB) 34" x 44" (12.1 MB)
Assembly District 16 11" x 17" (2.1 MB) 34" x 44" (11.4 MB)
Assembly District 17 11" x 17" (1.4 MB) 34" x 44" (9.4 MB)
Assembly District 18 11" x 17" (1.8 MB) 34" x 44" (10.7 MB)
Assembly District 19 11" x 17" (2.3 MB) 34" x 44" (12.3 MB)
Assembly District 20 11" x 17" (2.0 MB) 34" x 44" (12.0 MB)
Assembly District 21 11" x 17" (2.0 MB) 34" x 44 (12.1 MB)
Assembly District 22 11" x 17" (2.3 MB) 34" x 44" (12.0 MB)
Assembly District 23 11" x 17" (1.9 MB) 34" x 44" (9.8 MB)
Assembly District 24 11" x 17" (2.4 MB) 34" x 44" (11.0 MB)
Assembly District 25 11" x 17" (2.3 MB) 34" x 44" (12.12 MB)
Assembly District 26 11" x 17" (1.8 MB) 34" x 44" (9.9 MB)
Assembly District 27 11" x 17" (2.4 MB) 34" x 44" (13.4 MB)
Assembly District 28 11" x 17" (1.7 MB) 34" x 44" (10.8 MB)
Assembly District 29 11" x 17" (1.9 MB) 34" x 44" (12.8 MB)
Assembly District 30 11" x 17" (1.8 MB) 34" x 44" (11.1 MB)
Assembly District 31 11" x 17" (1.8 MB) 34" x 44" (11.2 MB)
Assembly District 32 11" x 17" (2.3 MB) 34" x 44" (13.8 MB)
Assembly District 33 11" x 17" (1.5 MB) 34" x 44" (10.5 MB)
Assembly District 34 11" x 17" (2.0 MB) 34" x 44" (12.8 MB)
Assembly District 35 11" x 17" (1.5 MB) 34" x 44" (10.0 MB)
Assembly District 36 11" x 17" (2.0 MB) 34" x 44" (12.5 MB)
Assembly District 37 11" x 17" (2.0 MB) 34" x 44" (12.1 MB)
Assembly District 38 11" x 17" (1.9 MB) 34" x 44" (11.0 MB)
Assembly District 39 11" x 17" (1.8 MB) 34" x 44" (11.3 MB)
Assembly District 40 11" x 17" (1.7 MB) 34" x 44" (10.2 MB)
Assembly District 41 11" x 17" (1.9 MB) 34" x 44" (12.3 MB)
Assembly District 42 11" x 17" (1.7 MB) 34" x 44" (11.3 MB)
Board of Regents of the University of Nevada (click here to collapse or expand)
Districts are January 1, 2012, for the purpose of filing for office and for nominating and electing members, and on January 8, 2013, for all other purposes.
  • Maps (click here to collapse or expand)
Overview Maps:
Statewide 17" x 22" (4.0 MB)  
Las Vegas Detail 17" x 22" (3.4 MB)  
Western Nevada Detail 17" x 22" (3.3 MB)  
Individual District Maps:
District 1 11" x 17" (2.4 MB) 34" x 44" (12.5 MB)
District 2 11" x 17" (2.4 MB) 34" x 44" (13.9 MB)
District 3 11" x 17" (2.5 MB) 34" x 44" (13.6 MB)
District 4 11" x 17" (2.1 MB) 34" x 44" (13.2 MB)
District 5 11" x 17" (2.7 MB) 34" x 44" (12.2 MB)
District 6 11" x 17" (2.6 MB) 34" x 44" (16.1 MB)
District 7 11" x 17" (2.3 MB) 34" x 44" (14.2 MB)
District 8 11" x 17" (3.0 MB) 34" x 44" (15.4 MB)
District 9 11" x 17" (2.5 MB) 34" x 44" (16.4 MB)
District 10 11" x 17" (2.2 MB) 34" x 44" (27.6 MB)
District 11 11" x 17" (2.5 MB) 34" x 44" (16.2 MB)
District 12 11" x 17" (2.1 MB) 34" x 44" (11.3 MB)
District 13 11" x 17" (2.5 MB) 34" x 44" (12.3 MB)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Employment Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us |   


© Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo