Nevada Legislature Home
A Service of the Nevada Legislature
Banner Banner

✔ 2018 Election Information

Dates


  • Primary Election: June 12, 2018 (NRS 293.175)
    • Registration Deadlines (NRS 293.560)
      • Registration Received by Mail: Must be Postmarked No Later Than May 15, 2018
      • In-Person Registration: May 22, 2018
      • Online Registration: May 24, 2018
    • Early Voting: May 26, 2018, through June 8, 2018
    • Absent Voter Ballots:
      • Deadline to Request: June 5, 2018
      • Deadline to Return: June 12, 2018
    • Primary Election Roster of Candidates for the 2019 Legislature

  • General Election: November 6, 2018 (NRS 293.12755)
    • Registration Deadlines (NRS 293.560)
      • Registration Received by Mail: Postmarked No Later Than October 9, 2018
      • In-Person Registration: October 16, 2018
      • Online Registration: October 18, 2018
    • Early Voting: October 20, 2018, through November 2, 2018
    • Absent Voter Ballots:
      • Deadline to Request: October 30, 2018
      • Deadline to Return: November 6, 2018

Helpful Links and Documents


✔ Voter Registration Information

Do you want to register?

Nevada residents can register to vote at the following places:


Are you overseas or in the military?


More information on registering to vote


Voter registration statistics

✔ Contact Major Elected Officials

✔ Historical Information

Archived versions of the Vote Nevada website:
  • 2016    2014    2012    2010    2008    2006    2004
  • These pages are snapshots in time. They are not updated, so it is likely that some of the links, especially to external websites, will be broken.

Additional resources of historical information:

Thank you for visiting Vote Nevada, a guide to unbiased election information and resources.

If you have any questions about the Research Division's web pages, please contact us.
  Last updated 3/28/2018