79th (2017) Regular Session
Expenditure Reporting Dates


Month Report
Start Date
Report
End Date
First Date
To File
Last Day to File
without Penalty
February 2/4/2017 2/28/2017 3/1/2017 3/11/2017
March 3/1/2017 3/31/2017 4/1/2017 4/10/2017
April 4/1/2017 4/30/2017 5/1/2017 5/10/2017
May 5/1/2017 5/31/2017 6/1/2017 6/10/2017
June 6/1/2017 6/3/2017 6/4/2017 7/10/2017

Late Reporting: Paid Lobbyists will be subject to a $10 per day fine for late filing. Any lobbyist that does not report within 30 days of the first date to file will be subject to having their lobbying privileges revoked.

Early Termination and End of Session: All lobbyists will be required to file a Final Report of Activity. All monthly expenditure reports must be filed and any outstanding fines must be paid before the report can be filed.