80th (2019) Session
The 80th (2019) Session of the Nevada Legislature began on February 4, 2019 at 11:28 AM and adjourned sine die on June 4, 2019 at 12:15 AM.
79th (2017) Session
The 79th (2017) Session of the Nevada Legislature began on February 6, 2017 at 11:15 AM and adjourned sine die on June 6, 2017 at 12:19 AM.
30th (2016) Special Session
The 30th (2016) Special Session of the Nevada Legislature began on October 10, 2016 at 8:15 AM and adjourned sine die on October 14, 2016 at 1:44 PM.
29th (2015) Special Session
The 29th (2015) Special Session of the Nevada Legislature began on December 16, 2015 at 5:00 PM and adjourned sine die on December 19, 2015 at 4:08 PM.
78th (2015) Session
The 78th (2015) Session of the Nevada Legislature began on February 2, 2015 at 11:16 AM and adjourned sine die on June 1, 2015 at 12:16 AM.
28th (2014) Special Session
The 28th (2014) Special Session of the Nevada Legislature began on September 10, 2014 at 12:41 PM and adjourned sine die on September 11, 2014 at 9:51 PM.
27th (2013) Special Session
The 27th (2013) Special Session of the Nevada Legislature began on June 4, 2013 at 6:46 AM and adjourned sine die on June 4, 2013 at 9:05 AM.
77th (2013) Session
The 77th (2013) Session of the Nevada Legislature began on February 4, 2013 at 11:24 AM and adjourned sine die on June 4, 2013 at 12:45 AM.
76th (2011) Session
The 76th (2011) Session of the Nevada Legislature began on February 7, 2011 at 11:01 AM, and adjourned sine die on June 7, 2011, at 1:20 AM.
26th (2010) Special Session
The 26th (2010) Special Session of the Nevada Legislature began on February 23, 2010, at 9:00 AM and adjourned sine die on March 1, 2010, at 2:16 AM.
75th (2009) Session
The 75th (2009) Session of the Nevada Legislature began on February 2, 2009, and adjourned sine die at 12:24 AM on June 2, 2009.
25th (2008) Special Session
The 25th (2008) Special Session of the Nevada Legislature began on December 8, 2008, at 9:07 AM and adjourned sine die on December 8, 2008, at 5:54 PM.
24th (2008) Special Session
The 24th (2008) Special Session of the Nevada Legislature began on June 27, 2008, at 10:14 AM and adjourned sine die on June 27, 2008, at 10:22 PM.
23rd (2007) Special Session
The 23rd (2007) Special Session of the Nevada Legislature began on June 5, 2007, at 5:06 PM and adjourned sine die on June 5, 2007, at 8:49 PM.
74th (2007) Session
The 74th (2007) Session of the Nevada Legislature began on February 5, 2007, at 12:09 PM and adjourned sine die on June 5, 2007, at 2:40 AM.
22nd (2005) Special Session
The 22nd (2005) Special Session of the Nevada Legislature began on June 7, 2005, at 4:13 AM and adjourned sine die on June 7, 2005, at 12:44 PM.
73rd (2005) Session
The 73rd (2005) Session of the Nevada Legislature began on February 7, 2005, at 11:57 AM and adjourned sine die on June 7, 2005 at 2:29 AM.
21st (2004) Special Session
The 21st (2004) Special Session of the Nevada Legislature began on November 10, 2004, at 10:54 AM and adjourned sine die on December 4, 2004, at 4:08 PM.
20th (2003) Special Session
The 20th (2003) Special Session of the Nevada Legislature began on June 25, 2003, at 9:53 AM and adjourned sine die on July 22, 2003, at 1:32 AM.
19th (2003) Special Session
The 19th (2003) Special Session of the Nevada Legislature began on June 3, 2003, at 4:00 PM and adjourned sine die on June 12, 2003, at 12:28 PM.
72nd (2003) Session
The 72nd (2003) Session of the Nevada Legislature began on February 3, 2003, at 12:00 PM, and adjourned sine die on June 3, 2003, at 1:25 AM.
18th (2002) Special Session
The 18th (2002) Special Session of the Nevada Legislature began July 29, 2002, at 9:19 AM and adjourned sine die on August 1, 2002, at 4:26 AM.
17th (2001) Special Session
The 17th (2001) Special Session of the Nevada Legislature began on June 14, 2001, at 10:20 AM and adjourned sine die on June 15, 2001, at 12:26 AM.
71st (2001) Session
The 71st (2001) Session of the Nevada Legislature began on February 5, 2001, at 12:00 PM and adjourned sine die on June 5, 2001, at 1:51 AM.
70th (1999) Session
The 70th (1999) Session of the Nevada Legislature began on February 1, 1999, at 12:00 PM and adjourned sine die on May 31, 1999, at 11:44 PM.
69th (1997) Session
The 69th Session of the Nevada Legislature began on January 20, 1997, at 12:00 PM and adjourned sine die on July 7, 1997, at 10:21 AM.
68th (1995) Session
The 68th Session of the Nevada Legislature began on January 16, 1995, at 12:00 PM and adjourned sine die on July 3, 1995, at 1:20 AM.
67th (1993) Session
The 67th Session of the Nevada Legislature began on January 18, 1993, at 12:00 PM and adjourned sine die on July 2, 1993, at 9:40 PM.
66th (1991) Session
The 66th Session of the Nevada Legislature began on January 21, 1991, at 12:00 PM and adjourned sine die on June 30, 1991, at 11:53 PM.
16th (1989) Special Session
The 16th Special Session of the Nevada Legislature began on November 21, 1989, at 10:00 AM and adjourned sine die on November 21, 1989, at 12:14 PM.
65th (1989) Session
The 65th Session of the Nevada Legislature began on January 16, 1989, at 12:00 PM and adjourned sine die on July 1, 1989, at 4:32 AM.
64th (1987) Session
The 64th Session of the Nevada Legislature began on January 19, 1987, at 12:00 PM and adjourned sine die on June 18, 1987, at 3:45 AM.
63rd (1985) Session
The 63rd Session of the Nevada Legislature began on January 21, 1985, at 12:00 PM and adjourned sine die in on June 4, 1985, at 6:27 PM.