Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag

SB1  Makes appropriation to Legislative Fund for costs of 20th Special Session. (BDR S-27)
  Introduced On: Jun 25, 2003
  By: Raggio  Titus 
  Most Recent History Action: Jul 03, 2003 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 1.
SB2  Makes various changes to provisions pertaining to business. (BDR 7-11)
  Introduced On: Jun 25, 2003
  By: Committee of the Whole 
  Most Recent History Action: Jul 22, 2003 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 4.
SB3  Makes various changes pertaining to regulation of gaming. (BDR 41-12)
  Introduced On: Jun 25, 2003
  By: Committee of the Whole 
  Most Recent History Action: Jul 03, 2003 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 2.
SB4  Makes appropriations to State Distributive School Account for class-size reduction. (BDR S-9)
  Introduced On: Jun 25, 2003
  By: Committee of the Whole 
  Most Recent History Action: Jun 26, 2003 - (No further action taken.)
SB5  Makes various changes related to state financial administration. (BDR 32-8)
  Introduced On: Jun 25, 2003
  By: Committee of the Whole 
  Most Recent History Action: Jul 21, 2003 - In Senate.
SB6  Makes various changes concerning state financial administration. (BDR 32-14)
  Introduced On: Jun 26, 2003
  By: Committee of the Whole 
  Most Recent History Action: Jul 18, 2003 - Assembly Amendment Nos. 3, 4, 7 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly.
SB7  Makes appropriation to Legislative Fund for costs of 20th Special Session of Nevada Legislature. (BDR S-50)
  Introduced On: Jul 21, 2003
  By: Raggio  Titus 
  Most Recent History Action: Jul 22, 2003 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 16.
SB8  Makes various changes concerning state financial administration. (BDR 32-49)
  Introduced On: Jul 21, 2003
  By: Committee of the Whole 
  Most Recent History Action: Jul 22, 2003 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 5.
SB9  Makes various changes concerning franchises for vehicles. (BDR 43-22)
  Introduced On: Jul 21, 2003
  By: Committee of the Whole 
  Most Recent History Action: Jul 22, 2003 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 17.
SB10  Makes conditional appropriations to National Judicial College and Louis W. McHardy National College of Juvenile and Family Justice. (BDR S-52)
  Introduced On: Jul 21, 2003
  By: Committee of the Whole 
  Most Recent History Action: Jul 22, 2003 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 18.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us |   


© Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo