Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
Bill Currently In: Most Recent History Action: On Summary
SB1 Approved by the Governor. Chapter 1. Jul 03, 2003 Makes appropriation to Legislative Fund for costs of 20th Special Session. (BDR S-27)
SB2 Approved by the Governor. Chapter 4. Jul 22, 2003 Makes various changes to provisions pertaining to business. (BDR 7-11)
SB3 Approved by the Governor. Chapter 2. Jul 03, 2003 Makes various changes pertaining to regulation of gaming. (BDR 41-12)
SB4 Senate (No further action taken.) Jun 26, 2003 Makes appropriations to State Distributive School Account for class-size reduction. (BDR S-9)
SB5 Senate (No further action taken.) Jul 21, 2003 Makes various changes related to state financial administration. (BDR 32-8)
SB6 Senate (No further action taken.) Jul 18, 2003 Makes various changes concerning state financial administration. (BDR 32-14)
SB7 Approved by the Governor. Chapter 16. Jul 22, 2003 Makes appropriation to Legislative Fund for costs of 20th Special Session of Nevada Legislature. (BDR S-50)
SB8 Approved by the Governor. Chapter 5. Jul 22, 2003 Makes various changes concerning state financial administration. (BDR 32-49)
SB9 Approved by the Governor. Chapter 17. Jul 22, 2003 Makes various changes concerning franchises for vehicles. (BDR 43-22)
SB10 Approved by the Governor. Chapter 18. Jul 22, 2003 Makes conditional appropriations to National Judicial College and Louis W. McHardy National College of Juvenile and Family Justice. (BDR S-52)
SR1 File No. 5 Jun 26, 2003 Adopts Rules of Senate for 20th Special Session of Legislature. (BDR R-2)
SR2 File No. 6 Jun 26, 2003 Provides that no allowances will be paid for 20th Special Session of Nevada Legislature for periodicals, stamps, stationery or communications. (BDR R-6)
SR3 File No. 7 Jun 26, 2003 Provides for appointment of attaches. (BDR R-4)
SR4 File No. 9 Jul 01, 2003 Acknowledges petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Governor requesting Nevada Supreme Court to direct Senate and Assembly to fulfill certain constitutional obligations. (BDR R-42)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us |   


© Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo