Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag

27th (2013) Special Session
All Bills That Became Law



|  Order By Chapter  |  Order By Bill  |



Assembly Bills

AB1 Chapter 4 Effective June 13, 2013, for the purpose of adopting any regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and July 1, 2013, for all other purposes. Section 5 of this act expires by limitation on June 30, 2017. Sections 3, 4, 6.5 and 7.3 to 10, inclusive, of this act expire by limitation on June 30, 2032.
  Makes various changes concerning the abatement or deferment of certain taxes imposed on a new or expanded business. (BDR 32-9)

AB2 Chapter 5 Effective June 13, 2013, for the purpose of performing any preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and July 1, 2013, for all other purposes.
  Revises provisions governing class-size reduction. (BDR 34-11)


Senate Bills

SB1 Chapter 1 Effective June 13, 2013 and expires by limitation on October 1, 2025.
  Makes various changes relating to the Clark County Sales and Use Tax Act of 2005. (BDR S-10)

SB2 Chapter 2 Effective July 1, 2013.
  Makes an appropriation to the Millennium Scholarship Trust Fund. (BDR S-12)

SB3 Chapter 3 Effective June 13, 2013.
  Revises provisions relating to the Account for Charter Schools. (BDR 34-13)




Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us |   


© Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo