Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag

28th (2014) Special Session
All Bills That Became Law



|  Order By Chapter  |  Order By Bill  |



Assembly Bills

AB1 Chapter 3 Effective September 11, 2014.
  Revises provisions governing the Economic Development Electric Rate Rider Program. (BDR 58-9)

AB2 Chapter 2 Effective September 11, 2014.
  Exempts certain manufacturers of electric passenger cars from the statutory requirements relating to franchises for the sale of new vehicles and repairs or maintenance on motor vehicles. (BDR 43-10)

AB3 Chapter 1 Sections 2 and 4 of this act effective January 1, 2016. Sections 1 and 3 of this act effective January 1, 2021.
  Revises provisions governing the general tax on insurance premiums. (BDR 57-8)


Senate Bills

SB1 Chapter 4 Effective September 11, 2014. Section 38 of this act expires by limitation on December 31, 2014. Sections 21 and 22 of this act expire by limitation on June 30, 2023. Sections 2 to 20, inclusive, 23 to 37, inclusive, 39 and 40 of this act expire by limitation on June 30, 2036.
  Revises provisions relating to commerce. (BDR 32-14)




Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo