AB3
Introduced in the Assembly on Sep 10, 2014.
By: Committee of the Whole

Revises provisions governing the general tax on insurance premiums. (BDR 57-8)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 1.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Committee of the Whole     Sep 10, 2014     01:00 PM      Agenda            Do pass
  Senate Committee of the Whole     Sep 11, 2014     See Agenda      Agenda            Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Sep 11, 2014   Yea 39,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0,  Vacant 1
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Sep 11, 2014   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Sep 10, 2014

  • Read first time.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • To printer.
  • From printer.
  • To Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Referred to Committee of the Whole.
  • To committee.
  • From committee: Considered.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.

Sep 11, 2014

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time.
  • Referred to Committee of the Whole.
  • From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor.

Sep 12, 2014

  • Chapter 1.
  • Sections 2 and 4 of this act effective January 1, 2016. Sections 1 and 3 of this act effective January 1, 2021.