SB1
Introduced in the Senate on Sep 10, 2014.
By: Committee of the Whole

Revises provisions relating to commerce. (BDR 32-14)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 4.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Committee of the Whole     Sep 11, 2014     08:00 AM      Agenda            Do pass
  Senate Committee of the Whole     Sep 11, 2014     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Sep 11, 2014   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Sep 11, 2014   Yea 39,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0,  Vacant 1


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 1   

Bill History

Sep 10, 2014

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee of the Whole. To printer.

Sep 11, 2014

  • From printer.
  • To committee.
  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time.
  • Referred to Committee of the Whole.
  • To committee.
  • From committee: Considered.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 4.
  • Effective September 11, 2014. Section 38 of this act expires by limitation on December 31, 2014. Sections 21 and 22 of this act expire by limitation on June 30, 2023. Sections 2 to 20, inclusive, 23 to 37, inclusive, 39 and 40 of this act expire by limitation on June 30, 2036.