AB2
Introduced in the Assembly on Sep 09, 2014.
By: Committee of the Whole

Exempts certain manufacturers of electric passenger cars from the statutory requirements relating to franchises for the sale of new vehicles and repairs or maintenance on motor vehicles. (BDR 43-10)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 2.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Committee of the Whole     Sep 10, 2014     01:00 PM      Agenda            Do pass
  Senate Committee of the Whole     Sep 11, 2014     See Agenda      Agenda            Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Sep 11, 2014   Yea 39,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0,  Vacant 1
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Sep 11, 2014   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 2   

Bill History

Sep 09, 2014

  • Prefiled.
  • Referred to Committee of the Whole.
  • To printer. From printer.

Sep 10, 2014

  • Read first time.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • To committee.
  • From committee: Considered.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.

Sep 11, 2014

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 2.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.)
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time.
  • Referred to Committee of the Whole.
  • To committee.
  • From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor.

Sep 12, 2014

  • Chapter 2.
  • Effective September 11, 2014.