Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB378 - 68th Session (1995)
Introduced on: Mar 22, 1995
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Giunchigliani , Evans , Bache , Spitler , Buckley , Anderson , Manendo , Arberry , Fettic , Hettrick , Chowning , Close , Price , Tiffany , Dini , Sandoval , Freeman , Tripple , Perkins , Nolan , Krenzer , Williams , Ohrenschall , Lambert , Monaghan , Harrington , Schneider , Steel , de Braga , Neighbors , Segerblom , Goldwater
Makes various changes to provisions relating to domestic violence. (BDR 14-1002)
Fiscal Notes:
Effect on Local Government: Yes. Effect on the State or on Industrial Insurance: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 359. Section 6 of this act effective 12:01 a.m. on October 1, 1995. Remainder of this act effective October 1, 1995.

Votes
Senate Final Passage   Jun-24 Yea 21, Nay 0, Excused 0, Not Voting 0, Absent 0
Assembly Final Passage Jun-20 Yea 42, Nay 0, Excused 0, Not Voting 0, Absent 0


Bill History
 
Mar 22, 1995 Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
Mar 23, 1995 From printer. To committee.
Dates discussed in committee: 4/18, 4/24, 5/30, 5/31, 6/7 (A&DP)
Jun 19, 1995 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
(Amendment number 867.)
Placed on Second Reading File.
Read second time. Amended. To printer.
Jun 20, 1995 From printer. To engrossment.
Engrossed. First reprint.
Placed on General File.
Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. ( 42 Yeas, 0 Nays, 0 Absent, 0 Excused, 0 Not Voting.) To Senate.
In Senate.
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
Dates discussed in committee: 6/22 (DP)
Jun 22, 1995 From committee: Do pass.
Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution and placed on General File for next legislative day.
Jun 23, 1995 Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
Jun 24, 1995 Read third time. Passed. Title approved. ( 21 Yeas, 0 Nays, 0 Absent, 0 Excused, 0 Not Voting.) To Assembly.
In Assembly.
To enrollment.
Jun 25, 1995 Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
Jun 26, 1995 Approved by the Governor. Chapter 359.
 Section 6 of this act effective 12:01 a.m. on October 1, 1995. Remainder of this act effective October 1, 1995.