Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB299 - 68th Session (1995)
Introduced on: Mar 22, 1995
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Jacobsen ,
Requires sheriff to issue permits to carry concealed firearms to certain persons and revises provisions prohibiting carrying of certain concealed weapons. (BDR 15-1360)
Fiscal Notes:
Effect on Local Government: Yes. Effect on the State or on Industrial Insurance: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 713. Effective October 1, 1995.

Votes
Senate Final Passage   Jun-16 Yea 19, Nay 2, Excused 0, Not Voting 0, Absent 0
Assembly Final Passage Jul-01 Yea 37, Nay 5, Excused 0, Not Voting 0, Absent 0


Bill History
 
Mar 22, 1995 Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
Mar 23, 1995 From printer. To committee.
Dates discussed in committee: 3/28, 3/30, 4/21, 4/25, 6/10, 7/1 (A&DP)
Jun 14, 1995 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
(Amendment number 949.)
Jun 15, 1995 Read second time. Amended. To printer.
Jun 16, 1995 From printer. To engrossment.
Engrossed. First reprint. Placed on General File.
Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. ( 19 Yeas, 2 Nays, 0 Absent, 0 Excused, 0 Not Voting.) To Assembly.
Jun 17, 1995 In Assembly.
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
Dates discussed in committee: 6/22, 6/26, 6/30 (A&DP)
Jun 30, 1995 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
(Amendment number 1498.)
Placed on Second Reading File.
Read second time. Amended. To printer.
Jul 01, 1995 From printer. To re-engrossment.
Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
Placed on General File.
Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. ( 37 Yeas, 5 Nays, 0 Absent, 0 Excused, 0 Not Voting.) To Senate.
In Senate.
Jul 02, 1995 Assembly amendment not concurred in. To Assembly.
In Assembly.
Assembly amendment not receded from. Conference requested. First Committee on Conference appointed by Assembly. To Senate.
The Speaker appoints Assemblymen Carpenter, Anderson, and Humke as a first Committee on Conference.
In Senate.
First Committee on Conference appointed by Senate. To committee.
The President appoints Senators McGinness, James, and Regan as a First Committee on Conference.
From committee: Concur in Assembly amendment and further amend.
First Conference report adopted by Senate.
First Conference report adopted by Assembly.
Jul 03, 1995 To printer.
Jul 06, 1995 From printer. To re-engrossment.
Re-engrossed. Third reprint.
To enrollment.
Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
Jul 07, 1995 Approved by the Governor. Chapter 713.
 Effective October 1, 1995.